This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/29/2023 at 01:29:54 (UTC).

Jane Roe 1 vs. Riverdale Assembly of God, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Jane Roe 1 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Riverdale Assembly of God, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Negin, Stephanie, Skiles, Jon M and Whalen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1945

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

Skiles, Jon M

Whalen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Roe 1

Defendants

Riverdale Christian Academy

The General Council of the Assemblies of God

a foreign non-profit religious corporation

The Southern California District Council of the Assemblies of God

a California non-profit religious corporation

Spencer, Charles, JR

Riverdale Assembly of God, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dias, Steven S.

Defendant Attorneys

Brown, Kevin M

Church, Rayma J.

Sherman, Sam G.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

10/14/2022: Minute Order Attachment

8/22/22 Proof of Service

08/22/2022: 8/22/22 Proof of Service

4/27/2023 Minute Order Attachment

04/27/2023: 4/27/2023 Minute Order Attachment

4/12/23 Notice of Jury Fees

04/12/2023: 4/12/23 Notice of Jury Fees

10-21-22 Request for Dismissal of Causes of Action No. 3 and 4 as to Charles Spencer, Jr.

10/21/2022: 10-21-22 Request for Dismissal of Causes of Action No. 3 and 4 as to Charles Spencer, Jr.

Defendant's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

02/21/2023: Defendant's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

10/21/22 Answer

10/21/2022: 10/21/22 Answer

12/21/22 Jury Fees Paid

12/21/2022: 12/21/22 Jury Fees Paid

10-21-22 Request for Dismissal of Causes of Action No. 3 and 4 as to Charles Spencer, Jr.

10/21/2022: 10-21-22 Request for Dismissal of Causes of Action No. 3 and 4 as to Charles Spencer, Jr.

4/26/23 Case Management Statement

04/26/2023: 4/26/23 Case Management Statement

04/18/23 Association of Counsel

04/18/2023: 04/18/23 Association of Counsel

4/12/23 Case Management Statement

04/12/2023: 4/12/23 Case Management Statement

4/12/23 Case Management Statement

04/12/2023: 4/12/23 Case Management Statement

73642CaseMana0001cb2

04/06/2023: 73642CaseMana0001cb2

Case Management Statement

04/04/2023: Case Management Statement

12-28-22 Defendant's Association of Attorney

12/28/2022: 12-28-22 Defendant's Association of Attorney

10/12/22 - Case Management Statement

10/12/2022: 10/12/22 - Case Management Statement

8/12/22 - Summons on First Amended

08/15/2022: 8/12/22 - Summons on First Amended

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Attorney Brian Forsthye special appearing on behalf of attorney Steven S. Dias Attorney Jessica Mulianey special appearing on behalf of attorney Sherman Sam, G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: HRG date 4/27/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed; Comment: Homan, Stone & Rossi - Associated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Spencer, Charles, JR: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-24649 Spencer, Charles $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Spencer, Charles, JR: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Defendant Charles Spencer, Jr. Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: **order signed and processed on 8/2/22**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Steven Dias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx parte Filed; Comment: Hearing 8/2/22 ~ Ex Parte Application for In Camera Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jane Roe 1: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-39095 Roe 1, Jane $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jane Roe 1: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Jane Roe 1; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less