This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/27/2020 at 13:47:38 (UTC).

James Files vs. RV Country, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 James Files filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RV Country, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4131

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Files, James

Defendants

Everet, Paul

Curtis, Charles E

RV Country, Inc.

Power, Charlie

Cantrell, Dale

Evert, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whelan, Brian D

Defendant Attorneys

Wilkins, James H.

Perkins, Michael K

Ranen, Jeffrey S

Kruthers, Mark D.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Files) 2.6.20.pdf

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Paul Everet (no POS-010 form)

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - RV Country, Inc.

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Charles E. Curtis

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: to Notice of Related Cases

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Case; Comment: Notice of Related Cases

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

POS (Files) 2.6.20.pdf

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Cases (Files) 2.6.20.pdf; Comment: Notice of Related Cases

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Charlie Power (no POS-010 form)

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Dale Cantrell (no POS-010 form)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMotion - Consolidate- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Mike Perkins 20CECG00389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Request; Comment: forwaded to dept. 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: leave to file 1st Amended Complaint and ***shall be deemed filed on 5/20/2020 per Order***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Stipulation and Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to clerk's office for further processing on 5/26/2020** ***Forwarded to Dept. 503*** Stipulation and order allowing Plaintiff to File the Proposed First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Dale Cantrell (no POS-010 form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - RV Country, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Charles E. Curtis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Files, James: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-90469 Files, James $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Files, James: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Files, James; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whelan, Brian D