This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/24/2020 at 23:19:12 (UTC).

Jack J. Scott (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Jack J Scott Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0624

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Executor

Crump, Carolyn F.

Decedent

Scott, Jack J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

Lucich, Nicholas L, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Re: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPetition - Distribution- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: First and Final Report of Executor and Petition for Reimbursement of Attorneys' Costs, for Statutory Attorneys' Fees, and for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crump, Carolyn F.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-07963 Crump, Carolyn F. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crump, Carolyn F.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Comment: Notice of Hearing re First & Final Report of Executor and Petition for Reimbursement of Attorneys' Costs, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Accounting and Acceptance of Trust and Declaration of Trustee of Intervivos Trust in Support of Petition for Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution- Comment: First and Final Report of Executor and Petition for Reimbursement of Attorneys' Costs, for Statutory Attorneys' Fees, and for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Re: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal- Comment: Final Total: $431,603.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Administration to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Order Appointing Executor; Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate with full authority (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketPetition - Probate- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion; Comment: Petititon for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary: Authorization to Administer Under IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication- Comment: Declaration of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate- Comment: Hearing: 8/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crump, Carolyn F.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-51041 Crump, Carolyn F. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crump, Carolyn F.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Crump, Carolyn F.; Total Financial Assessment $895.50; Total Payments and Credits $895.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities- Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities (Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate (Initial)- Comment: Petititon for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary: Authorization to Administer Under IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.