This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/14/2020 at 16:03:33 (UTC).

Jack Fitzpatrick vs. Clovis Unified School District

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Jack Fitzpatrick filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Clovis Unified School District. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2688

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fitzpatrick, Jack

Defendants

Bennett, Hillaree

Clovis Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hitchcock, Kara L.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Calendar Setting; CMC on 1/21 reset to 1/19

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Calendar setting

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Pursposes

Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self

Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self; Comment: Judge D Tyler Tharpe.

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 501 Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 1:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of Calendar Setting; CMC on 1/21 reset to 1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Guardian Ad Litem Filed- Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Calendar setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Pursposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self- Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self; Comment: Judge D Tyler Tharpe.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fitzpatrick, Jack: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-61377 Fitzpatrick, Jack $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fitzpatrick, Jack: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Fitzpatrick, Jack; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received- Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for furhter processing PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 501 Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clovis Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hitchcock, Kara L.