This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 09:57:10 (UTC).

Isveth Villegas vs. Westcoast Dining, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 Isveth Villegas filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Westcoast Dining, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4629

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villegas, Isveth Sanchez

Defendants

Westcoast Dining, LLC

Allred, Kelly Jane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zavala, Gilbert

Defendant Attorney

Sanchez, Giulio A.

 

Court Documents

7/14/22 Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegatio

07/11/2022: 7/14/22 Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegatio

7/11/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/11/2022: 7/11/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/22 Summons

07/18/2022: 7/18/22 Summons

8/11/22 Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

07/11/2022: 8/11/22 Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

CV-15 Notice of Dismissal Hearing

07/14/2022: CV-15 Notice of Dismissal Hearing

2/2/2023 - Proof of Personal Service of OX

02/02/2023: 2/2/2023 - Proof of Personal Service of OX

1/31/23 Application and Order for Examination

01/31/2023: 1/31/23 Application and Order for Examination

Application for Examination

01/31/2023: Application for Examination

1/30/23 Declaration in Support of Application

01/30/2023: 1/30/23 Declaration in Support of Application

12/5/2022 - Notice of Entry of Order

12/05/2022: 12/5/2022 - Notice of Entry of Order

Order filed

11/17/2022: Order filed

11/16/2022 - Proposed Order

11/16/2022: 11/16/2022 - Proposed Order

Notice to Dispose Exhibits Sent

11/16/2022: Notice to Dispose Exhibits Sent

11/16/2022 Minute Order Attachment

11/16/2022: 11/16/2022 Minute Order Attachment

11/2/22-Declaration of Christofferson HRG 11/16/22

11/02/2022: 11/2/22-Declaration of Christofferson HRG 11/16/22

11/2/22- Request for Judicial Notice HRG 11/16/22

11/02/2022: 11/2/22- Request for Judicial Notice HRG 11/16/22

11/2/22- Memo of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion Strike and/or to Tax Costs HRG 11/16/22

11/02/2022: 11/2/22- Memo of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion Strike and/or to Tax Costs HRG 11/16/22

10/11/2022 Memorandum of Points & Authorities HRG 11/16/2022

10/11/2022: 10/11/2022 Memorandum of Points & Authorities HRG 11/16/2022

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketOrder of Examination; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOther; Served: 02/01/2023; Comment: OX Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Allred, Kelly Jane: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-06965 Allred, Kelly Jane $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Allred, Kelly Jane: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration in Support of Application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder Signed and Filed; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Order: Destroy Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: RE: Entry of Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs is denied; 2. Defendant's Amended Memorandum of Costs filed on September 22, 2022 in the amount of $4,993.81 is allowed and all costs to be paid by the Plaitniff; and 3. Interest on the cost award will accrue at the statutory rate of 10 percent per annum as of the date of this Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Villegas, Isveth Sanchez: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-42757 Villegas, Isveth Sanchez $385.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Villegas, Isveth Sanchez: Transaction Assessment $385.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Villegas, Isveth Sanchez; Total Financial Assessment $445.00; Total Payments and Credits $445.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: UDDI set for 9/13/22 at 8:30am in D404

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Comment: Commercial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less