This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 18:06:49 (UTC).

Irish Construction vs. Ace Design & Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Irish Construction filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ace Design Construction Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irish Construction

Defendant

Ace Design & Construction Inc

 

Court Documents

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Ace Design & Construction Inc; Awarded Against:; Irish Construction; Status: Granted; Status Date: 02/20/2020; Status Comment: Defendant, Ace Design & Construction Inc, does not owe Plaintiff, Irish Construction, any money on Plaintiff's claim.; Comment: Statement of Decision: The Court was provided with a conditional release waving all claims.; Party Names: Irish Construction; Ace Design & Construction Inc

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Joe Dunez, Super Intendent/Employee

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Pete Cerda, Officer

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Ace Design & Construction Inc; Awarded Against:; Irish Construction; Status: Granted; Status Date: 02/20/2020; Status Comment: Defendant, Ace Design & Construction Inc, does not owe Plaintiff, Irish Construction, any money on Plaintiff's claim.; Comment: Statement of Decision: The Court was provided with a conditional release waving all claims.; Party Names: Irish Construction; Ace Design & Construction Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketTaken under advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Joe Dunez, Super Intendent/Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Pete Cerda, Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Irish Construction; Parties Present- Defendant: Ace Design & Construction Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Irish Construction: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00000113 Irish Construction $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Irish Construction: Transaction Assessment $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Irish Construction: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00000111 Irish Construction $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Irish Construction: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Irish Construction; Total Financial Assessment $52.50; Total Payments and Credits $52.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less