This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 12:35:24 (UTC).

Iris Cisneros vs. The Kroger Co

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Iris Cisneros filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2845

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cisneros, Iris Paola

Defendants

The Kroger Co

Foods Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kalajian, Kevin B.

 

Court Documents

9/12/2022-Complaint

09/12/2022: 9/12/2022-Complaint

9/12/2022-Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/12/2022: 9/12/2022-Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2022-Summons

09/13/2022: 9/13/2022-Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

09/13/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cisneros, Iris Paola: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-56675 Cisneros, Iris Paola $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cisneros, Iris Paola: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Cisneros, Iris Paola; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foods Co #371 is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kalajian, Kevin B.