This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 at 19:51:28 (UTC).

Irene Elliott vs James Elliott, III

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Irene Elliott against James Elliott, III in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3638

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Elliott, Irene Irlas

Respondent

Elliott, James Allen, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • Hearing1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Preliminary and Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingRequest to Enter Default- Comment: entered as to respondent James Elliott, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingSimplified Financial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • HearingProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingPetition for Dissolution without Children- Comment: Summons issued yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Elliott, Irene Irlas: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Elliott, Irene Irlas: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Elliott, Irene Irlas; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less