This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 16:01:24 (UTC).

Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated vs. Medical Access Network, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Medical Access Network, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2933

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated

Defendant

Medical Access Network, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Agrall, Tracy A.

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-65835 Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Integrated Prescription Management, Incorporated; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Agrall, Tracy A.