This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:06:53 (UTC).

In the matter of Shavelle Camargo

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 In the matter of Shavelle Camargo was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pebet, Noelle and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0588

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pebet, Noelle

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Camargo, Shavelle

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Name Change OSC Filed

Name Change OSC Filed; Comment: Hearing set on: Date: 4/10/2020 Time: 9:30 am Dept: 404

Petition for name change filed

Petition for name change filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Name Change- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Camargo, Shavelle: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Camargo, Shavelle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Camargo, Shavelle; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName Change OSC Filed- Name Change OSC Filed; Comment: Hearing set on: Date: 4/10/2020 Time: 9:30 am Dept: 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for name change filed- Petition for name change filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.