This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/17/2019 at 00:19:15 (UTC).

In re: Tucker Family Trust dated April 26, 1996

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 In re Tucker Family Trust dated April 26, 1996 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0585

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tucker, Rita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Krbechek, Randolf

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • Continued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Verified Petition for Termination of Power of Attorney, for Removal of Trustee, and for Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Declaration- Comment: Declaration of Deputy Public Guardian Objecting to Appointment of a Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Nomination- Comment: Verified Nomination by Debbie Mill for the Fresno County Guardian to be the Guardian of Rita Tucker's Estate and Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Nomination- Comment: Debbie Milla's Verification in Support of the Verified Nomination for the Fresno County Guardian to be the Guardian of Rita Tucker's Estate and Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Petition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Verified Petition for Termination of Power of Attorney, for Removal of Trustee, and for Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Declaration- Comment: Declaration of Debbie Milla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Declaration- Comment: Declaration of Joey Milla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities- Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Exhibit List Filed- Comment: Index of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Document filed- Comment: Verification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Objection- Comment: Verified Objection to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Declaration- Comment: Declaration of Karen L. Lynch with exhibits and attached Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice of Hearing- Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Petition (Generic)- Comment: Verified Petition for Termination of Power of Attorney, for Removal of Trustee, and for Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Financial info for Tucker, Rita: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-48208 Tucker, Rita $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Financial info for Tucker, Rita: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Financial: Tucker, Rita; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.