This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/10/2022 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

In Re: 6764 North Selland Avenue, Fresno, CA 93711

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 In Re 6764 North Selland Avenue, Fresno, CA 93711 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2357

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

National Default Servicing Corporation

Defendant

6764 North Selland Avenue, Fresno, CA 93711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Butler, Chad L

 

Court Documents

8-3-22 Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus

08/03/2022: 8-3-22 Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus

8-3-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/03/2022: 8-3-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

8-3-22 Notice of Petition of Trustee National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds

08/03/2022: 8-3-22 Notice of Petition of Trustee National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds

8-3-22 (Proposed) Order Granting Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus

08/03/2022: 8-3-22 (Proposed) Order Granting Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus

8-3-22 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes

08/04/2022: 8-3-22 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes

Minute Order Attachment

08/12/2022: Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

08/12/2022: Order filed

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

08/12/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (minute order from chambers and order on petition ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: On petition for Deposit of Undistributed surplus proceeds of Trustee's sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for National Default Servicing Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-47532 National Default Servicing Corporation $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for National Default Servicing Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: National Default Servicing Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to RA on 8/4/2022 (Proposed) Order Granting Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Petition of Trustee National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code 2924j(c) & (d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Deposit Surplus Funds; Comment: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, CHAD L.