This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/23/2020 at 18:01:00 (UTC).

Huy Hoang vs Angelina Dung Tran

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Huy Hoang filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Angelina Dung Tran. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0883

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hoang, Huy Duc

Respondent

Dung Tran, Angelina Ngoc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Proof of Service of Summons- Comment: Served Angelina Ngoc Dung Tran 2-22-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Financial info for Hoang, Huy Duc: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2020-00001351 Hoang, Huy Duc $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Documents sent to- Comment: FL Supervisor Denied Fee Waiver for Tracking (NO FILE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Financial info for Hoang, Huy Duc: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Financial: Hoang, Huy Duc; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Documents sent to- Comment: FLEX-Fee waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Property Declaration- Comment: Separate property declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Property Declaration- Comment: community and quasi-community property declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Petition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.