This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:32:26 (UTC).

Vince Harris vs. John McCann

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Vince Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against John McCann. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0275

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vince, Harris

Harris, Vince

Defendants

McCann, John

McCann, John Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khashayar, Daryoosh

Defendant Attorney

Bonzell, Eric M

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

2.1.21 Harris Complaint - Final.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Proof of Service

Signed POS 15816660.pdf

Answer Filed

HARRIS ANSWER.pdf

Demand for Jury Trial filed

HARRIS DJT.pdf

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Defendants Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

HARRIS CMS.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

POS Vince Harris CMC.pdf; Comment: CMC statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Harris CMC Statement Final.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Final RFD.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Estimated 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Final RFD.pdf; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Harris, Vince; McCann, John Patrick; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Final RFD.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Estimated 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- HARRIS ANSWER.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Signed POS 15816660.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris, Vince: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-05187 Vince, Harris $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris, Vince: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Harris, Vince; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 2.1.21 Harris Complaint - Final.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonzell, Eric M.