This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 13:09:58 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE # 20CECG01978

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE 20CECG01978 was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3200

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company

an Oklahoma corporation

Defendants

Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

a California limited liability partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morison, William C

Defendant Attorney

Halverson, Joel L.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons on First Amended Complaint.pdf; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint

Amended Document Filed

First Amended Complaint.pdf; Comment: First Amended Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Hallmark Specialty's Summons.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Hallmark Specialty's Complaint.pdf

12.10.21 Minute Order Attachment from chambers and Order After Hearing

12/10/2021: 12.10.21 Minute Order Attachment from chambers and Order After Hearing

12.9.21 Minute Order Attachment

12/09/2021: 12.9.21 Minute Order Attachment

12/8/21 Notice of Change of Address.pdf

12/08/2021: 12/8/21 Notice of Change of Address.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

12/01/2021: Minute Order Attachment

2021-11-30 Hallmark's CMS.pdf

11/30/2021: 2021-11-30 Hallmark's CMS.pdf

Proof of Service

08/19/2021: Proof of Service

Request

08/19/2021: Request

Notice of Hearing

08/19/2021: Notice of Hearing

46235CaseMana00dd75e

08/19/2021: 46235CaseMana00dd75e

Minute Order Attachment

08/19/2021: Minute Order Attachment

2021-08-17 CMC stmt.pdf

08/17/2021: 2021-08-17 CMC stmt.pdf

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee)

07/15/2021: Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

07/08/2021: Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated; Comment: Filed 8/19/21 ~ Joel Halverson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party; Names: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP; Comment: see 12/10/2021 minute order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: William Morison (copied to lead case number)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition filed; Comment: Hearing 3/23/22 ~ Opposition to Demurrer (copied to lead case number)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers with Order After Hearing and clerk's certificate of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: and clerk's certificate of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMotion - Consolidate; Original Type: Motion - Consolidate; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: 20CECG01978 Michael Barnes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer Filed; Comment: and Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiff Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-71018 Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAIGHT BROWN & BONSTEEL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where an Oklahoma Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant