This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 13:17:54 (UTC).

Guillermo Ramirez vs. Hall Management Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Guillermo Ramirez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Hall Management Corp. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Tharpe, D Tyler and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2251

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Guillermo

Defendants

Hall Management Company

E.E Hall, Inc.

Hall Management Corp.

Hall Management Company dba EE Hall, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richtel, Joshua F.

Defendant Attorney

Parker, Connie M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled hearing

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: to be determined

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Hall Management Company

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Jury both; 4 to 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement filed- Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: to be determined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hall Management Corp.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Hall Management Corp.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Guillermo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50409 Ramirez, Guillermo $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Guillermo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Ramirez, Guillermo; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less