This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/23/2019 at 15:01:30 (UTC).

Guillermo Ramirez vs. Hall Management Company

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by Guillermo Ramirez against Hall Management Company in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2239

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Guillermo

Defendants

Hall Management Company

EE Hall, Inc.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC/CJAP

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Request for Refund Received - Pending Review

Request for Refund Received - Pending Review; Comment: Type of Refund: Filing Fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Refund Received - Pending Review- Request for Refund Received - Pending Review; Comment: Type of Refund: Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC/CJAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Ramirez, Guillermo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50452 Ramirez, Guillermo $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Ramirez, Guillermo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Ramirez, Guillermo; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less