This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 05:45:54 (UTC).

Goldman Sachs Bank USA vs. Francisco Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Goldman Sachs Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Francisco Rodriguez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0486

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldman Sachs Bank USA

Defendant

Rodriguez, Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Jessica M.

Defendant Attorney

Harutyunyan, Shahane

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Zwicker_5737625_COM_eABC.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Zwicker_5737625_SUM_eABC.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Zwicker_5737625_CCS_eABC.pdf

Proof of Service

POS_eABC_Proof_77003823.pdf

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez, Francisco: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-12927 Rodriguez, Francisco $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez, Francisco: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Rodriguez, Francisco; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS_eABC_Proof_77003823.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Goldman Sachs Bank USA: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-02945 Goldman Sachs Bank USA $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Goldman Sachs Bank USA: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Goldman Sachs Bank USA; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Zwicker_5737625_CCS_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Zwicker_5737625_SUM_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Zwicker_5737625_COM_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, JESSICA M.