This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 04:48:12 (UTC).

Gloria Miller vs. Christopher Priddy

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Gloria Miller filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Christopher Priddy. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0316

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miller, Gloria D

Trustee of the Gloria D. Miller Living Trust, dated December 17, 2014

Defendant

Priddy, Christopher Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pinion, G. Bryan

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

1/31/22 - Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

2/2/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/22 Request for Dismissal

08/11/2022: 8/11/22 Request for Dismissal

8/11/22 Proposed Order

08/11/2022: 8/11/22 Proposed Order

8/10/22 Minute Order + CM

08/10/2022: 8/10/22 Minute Order + CM

8-5-22 (Proposed) Order on Ex Parte Default Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

08/05/2022: 8-5-22 (Proposed) Order on Ex Parte Default Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

8-5-22 Declaration of Gloria D. Miller ISO Ex Parte Application for Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

08/05/2022: 8-5-22 Declaration of Gloria D. Miller ISO Ex Parte Application for Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

8-5-22 Declaration of G. Bryan Pinion ISO Ex Parte Application for Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

08/05/2022: 8-5-22 Declaration of G. Bryan Pinion ISO Ex Parte Application for Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

8-5-22 Ex Parte Application for Default Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

08/05/2022: 8-5-22 Ex Parte Application for Default Prove-Up Hearing - HRG 8/10/22

Civil Document

07/21/2022: Civil Document

Order Granted

07/12/2022: Order Granted

Minute Order Attachment

07/12/2022: Minute Order Attachment

7/7/22 Proposed Order re Ex Parte HRG 7/12/22

07/07/2022: 7/7/22 Proposed Order re Ex Parte HRG 7/12/22

7/7/22 Pinion Dec re Ex Parte HRG 7/12/22

07/07/2022: 7/7/22 Pinion Dec re Ex Parte HRG 7/12/22

7/7/22 Ex Parte Application re OST HRG 7/12/22

07/07/2022: 7/7/22 Ex Parte Application re OST HRG 7/12/22

Minute Order Attachment

06/14/2022: Minute Order Attachment

6/8/2022-Proposed Order on Ex Parte Default Prove Up Hearing-Hrg: 6/14/2022

06/08/2022: 6/8/2022-Proposed Order on Ex Parte Default Prove Up Hearing-Hrg: 6/14/2022

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names: Miller, Gloria D; Priddy, Christopher Lee; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Miller, Gloria D; Awarded Against; Priddy, Christopher Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment; Comment: (All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property adverse to Complainant's title to the property; and Does 1 through 40, inclusive; without prejudice)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: *Duplicate to Order received on 8/5/22*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: & CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDefault Hearing; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Brian Pinion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Miller, Gloria D: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-48337 Miller, Gloria D $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Miller, Gloria D: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: *order signed and fwd to clerks office 8/15/22* (Proposed) Order on Ex Parte Default Prove-Up Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 02/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Line 1.b and Line 1.c are incorrect.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Miller, Gloria D: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-06658 Miller, Gloria D $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Miller, Gloria D: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Miller, Gloria D; Total Financial Assessment $615.00; Total Payments and Credits $615.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINION, G BRYAN