This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 21:00:29 (UTC).

Ghulam Yousuf vs. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Ghulam Yousuf filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Tharpe, D Tyler, McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0955

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yousuf, Ghulam

Defendant and Cross Defendant

City of Fresno

Cross Plaintiff

Horizon Health & Subacute Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dawood, Sofian Solomon

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Costa, Kristi M

Stokes, Travis R.

Hendricks, Whitney L.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Forgey, Donald G.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

3269217_098YousufCas; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Change of Attorney and Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: CMC Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: filed by Plaintiff

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: req by both, 4-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice of Change of Attorney and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: 4-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketGovernment Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint- Comment: DEFECTIVE: Item #3b is incomplete; does not conform to CCP 416.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Yousuf, Ghulam: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-22107 Yousuf, Ghulam $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Yousuf, Ghulam: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Yousuf, Ghulam; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORGEY DONALD G.