This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 02:35:39 (UTC).

GCFS, INC., a California Corporation vs. Ricardo Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 GCFS, INC , a California Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ricardo Rodriguez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0094

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS, INC., a California Corporation

Defendants

Rodriguez, Ricardo

Cal North Farm Labor Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Brent David

 

Court Documents

1/5/2023 Complaint

01/05/2023: 1/5/2023 Complaint

1/5/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/05/2023: 1/5/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2023 Summons

01/06/2023: 1/6/2023 Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC., a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-01279 GCFS, INC., a California Corporation $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: GCFS, INC., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less