This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 00:23:56 (UTC).

GCFS, INC., a California corporation vs. Randy Bell

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 GCFS, INC , a California corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Randy Bell. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8607

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS, INC., a California corporation

Defendants

Bell, Randy

Bell, Randy Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Brent David

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Conditional Settlement Reached

12/20/21 - Notice of Settlement; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 6/15/2021

Proof of Service

12/20/21 - Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Scheduled Hearing Date: 8/17/2027 Time: 3:30 PM Dept: 402

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2027
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Scheduled Hearing Date: 8/17/2027 Time: 3:30 PM Dept: 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 12/20/21 - Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached- 12/20/21 - Notice of Settlement; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 6/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC., a California corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-71403 GCFS, INC., a California corporation $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GCFS, INC., a California corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GCFS, INC., a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant