This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 22:00:39 (UTC).

Gary Fountain (CONS/P)

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Gary Fountain CONS/P was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0631

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Payne, Shera

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • Continued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Citation for Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Continued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Document filed- Comment: Waiver of Notice of Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person (left blank)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Declaration- Comment: of Shera Payne re Probate Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Document filed- Comment: Waiver of Notice of Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Conservatorship Video Viewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Petition - Appoint Probate Conservator- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Investigator's Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Confidential Court Investigation Report- Comment: Fee waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Duties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Confidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)- Comment: (orders and letters)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Financial info for Payne, Shera: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Financial info for Payne, Shera: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Financial: Payne, Shera; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.