This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 16:52:46 (UTC).

Fresno Building Healthy Communities vs. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Fresno Building Healthy Communities filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0432

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Respondent

City of Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Caplan, Deborah B.

Respondent Attorney

Stokes, Travis R.

 

Court Documents

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

02/25/2019: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

3/1/22 Pet Reply HRG 3/8/22

03/01/2022: 3/1/22 Pet Reply HRG 3/8/22

3/1/22 Suppl Declaration HRG 3/8/22

03/01/2022: 3/1/22 Suppl Declaration HRG 3/8/22

2/23/22 Opposition

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Opposition

3-7-22 Notice Re Proofs of Service of Petitioner's Reply to Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees

03/07/2022: 3-7-22 Notice Re Proofs of Service of Petitioner's Reply to Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees

3/7/22 - Amended Proof of Service

03/07/2022: 3/7/22 - Amended Proof of Service

3-3-22 Petitioner's Response to Objections To Supplemental Declaration- HRG 3/8/22

03/03/2022: 3-3-22 Petitioner's Response to Objections To Supplemental Declaration- HRG 3/8/22

03.02.22 Respondent's Objection to Petitioner's Supplemental Declaration HRG 03.08.22

03/02/2022: 03.02.22 Respondent's Objection to Petitioner's Supplemental Declaration HRG 03.08.22

Notice of Motion

07/23/2021: Notice of Motion

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMotion - Attorney Fees; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Tom Willis (filed 7/23/21)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Notice Re Proofs of Service of Petitioner's Reply to Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: Proof of Service of Petitioner's Response To Objections To Supplemental Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse filed; Comment: Petitioner's Response to Objections To Supplemental Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection filed; Comment: Respondent's Objection to Petitioner's Supplemental Declaration HRG 03.08.22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Supplemental Declaration of Deborah B. Caplan in Support of Petitioner's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed; Comment: Petitioner's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Travis R. Stokes ISO Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition filed; Comment: Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Attorneys' Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-46030 Fresno Building Healthy Communities $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 02/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-09604 Fresno Building Healthy Communities $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Fresno Building Healthy Communities; Total Financial Assessment $777.00; Total Payments and Credits $777.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less