This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/05/2019 at 13:40:36 (UTC).

Fresno Building Healthy Communities vs. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Fresno Building Healthy Communities filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0432

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Respondent

City of Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Caplan, Deborah B.

Respondent Attorney

Costa, Kristi M

 

Court Documents

Response filed

Response; Comment: Petitioner Fresno Building Healthy Communities Response to Intervener Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Answer in Intervention

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Case; Comment: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service

2530929_345619CECG00; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service re: Answer

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: granting intervention

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing (Ex Parte App.-Leave to file Answer in Intervention)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 02.28.19** **PENDING*** Proposed Order Granting Intervention

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Petitioner's Complaint by Intervener Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Timothy Bittle Regarding Notice to Counsel, and Supporting Intervention

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Motion - Judgment on Plead- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Timothy Bittle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response filed- Response; Comment: Petitioner Fresno Building Healthy Communities Response to Intervener Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association's Answer in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Related Case; Comment: Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- 2530929_345619CECG00; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service re: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: granting intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing (Ex Parte App.-Leave to file Answer in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Ex Parte Hearing- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:29 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Tim Bittle - Answer in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 02.28.19** **PENDING*** Proposed Order Granting Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Petitioner's Complaint by Intervener Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Writ of Mandate- Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Financial: City of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Financial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-09604 Fresno Building Healthy Communities $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Financial info for Fresno Building Healthy Communities: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Financial: Fresno Building Healthy Communities; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah Barthel Caplan