This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 22:07:27 (UTC).

Freedom Mortgage Corporation vs. Briana Finney

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Freedom Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Briana Finney. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Whalen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8937

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Whalen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Mortgage Corporation

Defendant

Finney , Briana L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singer, Daniel I.

 

Court Documents

12/08/22 Complaint

12/08/2022: 12/08/22 Complaint

12/08/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/08/2022: 12/08/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/22 Summons

12/12/2022: 12/12/22 Summons

12/12/22 CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: 12/12/22 CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

01/22/2023 Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

01/23/2023: 01/22/2023 Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

02/03/2023: Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

3/21/2023 Case Management Statement, HRG: 4/6/2023

03/21/2023: 3/21/2023 Case Management Statement, HRG: 4/6/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: HRG: 4/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Comment: Type of Document:Summons Posting of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Freedom Mortgage Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-07551 Freedom Mortgage Corporation $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Freedom Mortgage Corporation: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 402 on 2/2/2023 Order for: Application and Order for Posting of Summons*** Order forwarded to clerk's office for further processing. ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Freedom Mortgage Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-76742 Freedom Mortgage Corporation $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Freedom Mortgage Corporation: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Freedom Mortgage Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $245.00; Total Payments and Credits $245.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set on 04/06/23 at 3:30 p.m., Department 402.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less