This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/02/2019 at 06:03:21 (UTC).

Four Seasons Contracting, LLC vs. Brook Gonzales

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Four Seasons Contracting, LLC against Brook Gonzales in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6284

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Four Seasons Contracting, LLC

Defendant

Gonzales, Brook

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC is set for 10/30/19 D402 at 8:30am

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC is set for 10/30/19 D402 at 8:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Four Seasons Contracting, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50333 Four Seasons Contracting, LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Four Seasons Contracting, LLC: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Four Seasons Contracting, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less