This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 16:09:39 (UTC).

Foreman Financial, Inc. vs. Kary Lamont Mitchell

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Foreman Financial, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kary Lamont Mitchell. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0532

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foreman Financial, Inc.

Defendants

Lamont Mitchell, Kary

Tennison, Vikkie

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name:Sevastian Llanez

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Foreman Financial, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Lamont Mitchell, Kary; Tennison, Vikkie; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $278.00; Total: $2778.00; Party Names: Foreman Financial, Inc.; Lamont Mitchell, Kary; Tennison, Vikkie

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Foreman Financial, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Lamont Mitchell, Kary; Tennison, Vikkie; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $278.00; Total: $2778.00; Party Names: Foreman Financial, Inc.; Lamont Mitchell, Kary; Tennison, Vikkie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name:Sevastian Llanez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $114.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $114.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Foreman Financial, Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2021-00001924 Foreman Financial, Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Foreman Financial, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Foreman Financial, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 09/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant