This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:01:53 (UTC).

Foreman Financial Inc. vs. James Wurster

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Foreman Financial Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against James Wurster. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0171

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foreman Financial Inc.

Defendant

Wurster, James Ernest

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim filed

03/09/2022: Plaintiff's Claim filed

3/30/22-Proof of Service

03/30/2022: 3/30/22-Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC; Served: 03/24/2022; Comment: Fee:$158.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Foreman Financial Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2022-00000516 Foreman Financial Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Foreman Financial Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Foreman Financial Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Plaintiff's Claim; File Date: 03/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant