This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 16:08:30 (UTC).

Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC vs. Chuck Navarrette

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chuck Navarrette. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7121

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC

Defendants

Navarrette, Chuck Michael

Navarrette, Chuck M,

California Department of Motor Vehicles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burstein, Arden D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Re: Venue

10/06/2022: Declaration Re: Venue

10/06/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/06/2022: 10/06/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/06/22 Complaint

10/06/2022: 10/06/22 Complaint

10/07/22 Summons

10/07/2022: 10/07/22 Summons

10/07/22 CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

10/07/2022: 10/07/22 CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2022 - Proof of Service

10/12/2022: 10/12/2022 - Proof of Service

11/10/2022 - Notice of Hearing

11/10/2022: 11/10/2022 - Notice of Hearing

11/10/2022 - Application Filed

11/10/2022: 11/10/2022 - Application Filed

11/10/2022 - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

11/10/2022: 11/10/2022 - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

11/18/2022 - Stipulation & Order

11/21/2022: 11/18/2022 - Stipulation & Order

Order filed

11/21/2022: Order filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for California Department of Motor Vehicles: Government Exemption Claimed $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for California Department of Motor Vehicles: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: California Department of Motor Vehicles; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Comment: Waiver of Appearance and of Monetary Recovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketGovernment Exemption Claimed; Comment: First Paper Filing Fee - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept: 402 Order for: Stipulation RE: Waiver of Appearance and of Monetary Recovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-70520 Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 10/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-62233 Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $430.00; Total Payments and Credits $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set on 01/31/2023 at 3:30 p.m., Department 402.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Re: Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURSTEIN ARDEN D.