This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 16:04:00 (UTC).

First Technology Federal Credit Union vs. Monica Aguilar Duenas

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 First Technology Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Monica Aguilar Duenas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Brickey, Gabriel and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1776

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Cullers, Mark

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Technology Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Aguilar Duenas, Monica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Jennifer A

 

Court Documents

3/22/22 - Complaint

03/22/2022: 3/22/22 - Complaint

3/22/22 - Summons

03/22/2022: 3/22/22 - Summons

3/22/22 - Cover Sheet

03/22/2022: 3/22/22 - Cover Sheet

3/22/22 CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

03/22/2022: 3/22/22 CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

4/1/2022 Proof of Service Summons; Complaint as to Monica A. Duenas

04/01/2022: 4/1/2022 Proof of Service Summons; Complaint as to Monica A. Duenas

04/28/22-Request for Entry of Default

04/28/2022: 04/28/22-Request for Entry of Default

05/11/2022 - Request for Default

05/11/2022: 05/11/2022 - Request for Default

05/11/2022 - Request for Dismissal

05/11/2022: 05/11/2022 - Request for Dismissal

05/11/2022 - Declaration CCP 585

05/11/2022: 05/11/2022 - Declaration CCP 585

05/11/2022 - Proposed order

05/11/2022: 05/11/2022 - Proposed order

05/11/2022 - Judgment

05/11/2022: 05/11/2022 - Judgment

5/17/22 Order Granted

05/17/2022: 5/17/22 Order Granted

6/1/2022 - Notice Of Judgment or Order

06/01/2022: 6/1/2022 - Notice Of Judgment or Order

6/7/2022 - Abstract Of Judgment

06/01/2022: 6/7/2022 - Abstract Of Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Technology Federal Credit Union: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-34411 First Technology Federal Credit Union $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Technology Federal Credit Union: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $15,165.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names: First Technology Federal Credit Union; Aguilar Duenas, Monica; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; First Technology Federal Credit Union; Awarded Against; Aguilar Duenas, Monica; Amount; Damages: $12,102.49; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 4.82 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $583.53; Attorney Fees: $2,065.37; Costs: $413.75; Total: $15165.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Declarationi Supoort of allowing copy of document to be filed in LIEU of Original and Order Thereon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Forward to Dept 404 on 05/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Declaration in Support of Allowing Copy of Document to be Filed in Lieu of Original and Order Thereon. Forward to Dept 404 on 05/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 03/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Technology Federal Credit Union: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-18163 First Technology Federal Credit Union $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Technology Federal Credit Union: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: First Technology Federal Credit Union; Total Financial Assessment $410.00; Total Payments and Credits $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set on 07/20/22 at 3:30 PM., Department 402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST TECHNOLOGY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH JENNIFER A.