This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 12:36:14 (UTC).

Financial Pacific Insurance Company vs Dean Holtermann

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Financial Pacific Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dean Holtermann. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2843

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

Defendant

Holtermann, Dean Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benson, Susan M.

Defendant Attorney

Hitchcock, Kara L.

 

Court Documents

9-12-22 Complaint

09/12/2022: 9-12-22 Complaint

9-12-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/12/2022: 9-12-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

9-13-22 Summons

09/13/2022: 9-13-22 Summons

9-13-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

09/13/2022: 9-13-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

9-13-22 Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Number

09/13/2022: 9-13-22 Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Number

9/26/2022-Proof of Service

09/26/2022: 9/26/2022-Proof of Service

10/11/2022-Answer

10/11/2022: 10/11/2022-Answer

10/11/2022-Notice of Remote Appearance

10/11/2022: 10/11/2022-Notice of Remote Appearance

Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

10/13/2022: Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order on Remote Appearance; Comment: Emailed to: kara.hitchcock@statefarm.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Regarding Remote Appearance Granted; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Comment: Party: Hitchcock, Kara L. Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Holtermann, Dean Allen: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-63043 Holtermann, Dean Allen $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Holtermann, Dean Allen: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Holtermann, Dean Allen; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance.; Comment: Party: Defendants Attorney Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketChambers Work - Notice of Remote Appearance; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 09/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Financial Pacific Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-56656 Financial Pacific Insurance Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Financial Pacific Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Financial Pacific Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Number

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hitchcock, Kara L.