This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 11:04:13 (UTC).

Filiberto Navarro vs. Maritza Lopez

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 Filiberto Navarro filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Maritza Lopez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Whalen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4101

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Whalen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Navarro, Filiberto

Defendants

Lopez, Maritza

Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc.

The American Bottling Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ghavimi, Aidin D.

Defendant Attorney

Devane, Laura E.

 

Court Documents

12-21-22 Complaint Filed

12/21/2022: 12-21-22 Complaint Filed

12-21-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2022: 12-21-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12-22-222 Summons Issued and Filed

12/22/2022: 12-22-222 Summons Issued and Filed

12-22-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

12/22/2022: 12-22-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

1/11/2023 - Proof of Service (Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc.)

01/11/2023: 1/11/2023 - Proof of Service (Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc.)

1/11/2023 - Proof of Service (The American Bottling Company)

01/11/2023: 1/11/2023 - Proof of Service (The American Bottling Company)

Notice Filed

01/26/2023: Notice Filed

70830Noticeof00cdeee

02/14/2023: 70830Noticeof00cdeee

2/15/2023-Request for Dismissal

02/15/2023: 2/15/2023-Request for Dismissal

Answer

02/16/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for The American Bottling Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-12096 The American Bottling Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for The American Bottling Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: The American Bottling Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Name: Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc.; Comment: Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Assignment of Judge for all purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Navarro, Filiberto: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-79597 Navarro, Filiberto $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Navarro, Filiberto: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Navarro, Filiberto; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less