This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/17/2019 at 22:00:27 (UTC).

Felipe Izaguirre (Spousal)

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Felipe Izaguirre Spousal was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0618

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pelham, Exaltacion Cruz

Decedent

Izaguirre, Felipe Sierra

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • Continued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Spousal Property Petition (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Supplement to- Comment: 2nd Supplement to: Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Spousal Property Petition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Spousal Property Petition (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Return Letter- Comment: Re: Request for Special Notice (submitted by Clyde Condit, Jr.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Supplement to- Comment: Supplement to: Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Request for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Return Letter- Comment: Check #105 (Request for Special Notice submitted by Mario G. Condit)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition (Initial)- Comment: orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Financial info for Pelham, Exaltacion Cruz: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00003343 Robin Schumacher $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Pelham, Exaltacion Cruz: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Pelham, Exaltacion Cruz; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.