Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 16:13:26 (UTC).

FCERA Realty Group, LLC vs. Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs, LP

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 FCERA Realty Group, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs, LP. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Tharpe, D Tyler and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1169

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Peters Roofing, Inc.

a California limited liability company

FCERA Realty Group, LLC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

a Nevada corporation

B&L Mechanical, Inc.

Peters Roofing, Inc.

a California corporation

Target Constructors, Inc.

ALCAL Specialty Contracting, Inc.

Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs, LP

A. Colmenero Plastering, Inc.

a California limited partnership

Johnson Fire Protection Incorporated

Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs II, LP

Zoes 1-100

ROES 1 through 250

Westech Systems, Inc.

MOES 1-100

Alcal Special Contracting

Johnson Fire Protection

The Plumbing CO., Inc.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sims, Bobby Dale, JR

Vote, Kurt F.

Chan, Phillip

Dorsey, David C.

Levy, David M.

Cote, Scott D.

Tristao, Craig A.

Innabi, Crystal T.

Richardson, Michael

Fife, Paul D.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Dorsey, David C.

Levy, David M.

Cote, Scott D.

Other Attorneys

Correll, Deborah A.

Thomasian, Elizabeth A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/22/19 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 2nd Cross Complaint

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: 2nd Cross Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMotion - Compel- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Request for admissions - Jennifer Poochigian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMotion - Compel- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Form interrogatories - Jenifer Poochigian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs, LP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-51218 Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs, LP $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Boardwalk at Palm Bluffs, LP: Transaction Assessment $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judical Notice- Request; Comment: In Support of Motion To Compel Further Responses to Request For Admissions and Form Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed- Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of Questions and Answers in Dispute In Support of Motion To Compel Further Responses to Request For Admissions and Form Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Motion; Comment: Declaration of Jennifer T. Poochigian In Support of Motion To Compel Further Responses to Request For Admissions and Form Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Motion; Comment: and Motion to: (1) Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions; (2) Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories; and (3) Request for Monetary Sanctions In The Sum of 5,717.00; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: After Pretrial Discovery Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FCERA Realty Group, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-26669 FCERA Realty Group, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FCERA Realty Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: FCERA Realty Group, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/22/19 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Nevada Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Westech Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where PLUMBING CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant