This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 16:13:05 (UTC).

Faitha Jenkins vs. Keolis Transit America, INC

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Faitha Jenkins filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Keolis Transit America, INC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2265

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jenkins, Faitha

an individual

Defendants

Keolis Transit America, INC

a corporation

Diversified Transportation, LLC

a limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yadidsion, Danny

Defendant Attorney

Gordon, Gabrielle E.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf

Proof of Service

DIVERSIFIED TRANSPORTATION, LLC,.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint - Final.pdf

Proof of Service

KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Minute Order Attachment

12/01/2021: Minute Order Attachment

11/24/21 Notice of Jury Deposit

11/24/2021: 11/24/21 Notice of Jury Deposit

11/24/21 CMC STMT

11/24/2021: 11/24/21 CMC STMT

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

09/23/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA.pdf

08/06/2021: KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA.pdf

DIVERSIFIED TRANSPORTATION, LLC,.pdf

08/06/2021: DIVERSIFIED TRANSPORTATION, LLC,.pdf

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

08/05/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons.pdf

08/05/2021: Summons.pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

08/04/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Complaint - Final.pdf

08/04/2021: Complaint - Final.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: & CM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Time Est. 6-8 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: & CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jenkins, Faitha: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-75111 Jenkins, Faitha $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jenkins, Faitha: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: HRG 12/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jenkins, Faitha: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-48747 Jenkins, Faitha $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jenkins, Faitha: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Jenkins, Faitha; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: **NOT a Class Action matter; per KCK 12/1/21**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVERSIFIED TRANSPORTATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLCARE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC. DBA FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant