This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:31:30 (UTC).

Faith Young vs. Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association Board of Retirement (FCERA)

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Faith Young filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association Board of Retirement FCERA. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2244

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Young, Faith R.

Respondent

Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association Board of Retirement (FCERA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Wille, Arthur G.

Armstrong, Craig W

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Writ of Mandate and Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Request for Administrative Record

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Writ of Mandate and Notice of Hearing

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: Second Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: for Administrative Records

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate CCP.1094.5 Revised Edition

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Petition - Writ of Mandate

Petition - Writ of Mandate

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 403 Order to : Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Lodge Administrative Record and Modify Briefing Schedule

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of draft copy of administrative record

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and certificate of mailing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Second Amended Writ of Mandate

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Second Amended Writ of Mandate

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Second Amended Writ of Mandate

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Request for Administrative Record

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Writ of Mandate and Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Request for Administrative

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAppellant Notice Designating Record - CTX Only- Comment: Clerk's Transcripts only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketGranted Waiver for Superior Court Fees on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Reinstated- Comment: Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule DCA: F081304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotification of Filing Notice of Appeal - Civil- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appeal Filed - Civil- Comment: Judgement Date: 4/23/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Order Denying the Petition for Writ of Mandate and Statement of Decision) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 04.23.2020 ) . Parties served: ------------------------- Faith R. Young 4676 E. Clinton Avenue, Apt 109 Fresno, CA 93703 Craig W Armstrong Baker Manock & Jensen, PC 5260 N. Palm Avenue, Suite 421 Fresno, CA 93704 ---------------------------

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Denying the Petition for Writ of Mandate and Statement of Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketTaken Under Submission or Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: re: Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Writ of Mandate and Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed- Amended Document Filed; Comment: Second Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Filed- Request Filed; Comment: for Administrative Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed- Amended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate CCP.1094.5 Revised Edition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Young, Faith R.: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Young, Faith R.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Young, Faith R.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Writ of Mandate- Petition - Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less