This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/30/2019 at 11:53:45 (UTC).

Eulalio Lozano vs Industrial Waste & Salvage Co, a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Eulalio Lozano filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Industrial Waste Salvage Co, a California Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3203

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lozano, Eulalio

Defendants

Caglia Environmental Fresno LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Caglia Environmental LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Orange Avenue Disposal Company, Inc., a California Corporation

Industrial Waste & Salvage Co, a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahoney, Michael

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Rescheduled Hearing

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • HearingCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Rescheduled Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lozano, Eulalio: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-70069 Lozano, Eulalio $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lozano, Eulalio: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Lozano, Eulalio; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange Avenue Disposal Company, Inc. is a litigant