This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 12:36:38 (UTC).

Esther Avila vs. Thong Do, M.D.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Esther Avila filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Thong Do, M D. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler, McGuire, Rosemary and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3870

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Avila, Faustino

Avila, Adalberto

Avila Garcia, Juana Maria

Avila, Estela

Avila, Maria

Avila, Esther G.

Avila, Juan Manuel

Defendants

DaVita, INC.

DaVita Coalinga Dialysis

DaVita Healthcare Partners, INC.

Bik, M.D., Lymar G.

Do, M.D., Thong

Coalinga Dialysis

Total Renal Care, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Androvich, Joseph A.

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Salinas, Richard S

Pascale, Matthew

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

3144056_961201911131; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt

Proof of Service

3103456_888201910281

Proof of Service

3103456_332201910281

Proof of Service

3103456_241201910281

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

3097464_493201910241; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

3097464_493201910241; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

3097464_284201910241

Civil Complaint filed

3097464_469201910241

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

3380643_812AvilaCMCS; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

3304530_104202001171

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

3295335_958202001151; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit of Defendant Thong H. Do, M.D.

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Amendment to Complaint

Proof of Service

3144056_416201911131

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 7-12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Carol O'Neal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMotion - File Amended Complaint- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Joseph Androvich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:32 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation - Not All Signed- ADR Stipulation; Comment: Not signed by: Deft. Total Renal Care, Inc - Atty. Vanessa Drake is not the Attorney on record or an Associated Attorney ADR method chosen: James Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed- Amended Document Filed; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: *Department Change*

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 3103456_888201910281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 3103456_332201910281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 3103456_241201910281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila, Esther G.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-84667 Avila, Esther G. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avila, Esther G.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Avila, Esther G.; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 3097464_493201910241; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 3097464_284201910241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 3097464_469201910241

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOTAL RENAL CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVITA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASCALE MATTHEW S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, WILLIAM M