This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/10/2019 at 12:16:37 (UTC).

Erik Arevalo vs. Energy Efficient Equity Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Erik Arevalo against Energy Efficient Equity Inc in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1414

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arevalo, Erik

Defendants

Hybrid

Myers Life Solutions, Inc

Energy Efficient Equity Inc.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Arevalo, Erik; Energy Efficient Equity Inc.; Myers Life Solutions, Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 2nd Continuance of Hearing

Amended Claim filed

Amended Claim filed; Comment: Plaintiff updated address, removed DBA and made changes to the name of the Agent for Service for Hibrid Myers Life Solution.

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 1st Continuance of Hearing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Deputy Clerk

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Arevalo, Erik; Energy Efficient Equity Inc.; Myers Life Solutions, Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 2nd Continuance of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Claim filed- Amended Claim filed; Comment: Plaintiff updated address, removed DBA and made changes to the name of the Agent for Service for Hibrid Myers Life Solution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 1st Continuance of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$15.00-Unserved Defective: No signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$15.00-Unserved Defective: No signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Transaction Assessment $3.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00009012 Arevalo, Erik $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Transaction Assessment $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00008689 Arevalo, Erik $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Transaction Assessment $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00007805 Arevalo, Erik $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Fee Waiver $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Arevalo, Erik: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial: Arevalo, Erik; Total Financial Assessment $117.80; Total Payments and Credits $117.80

    Read MoreRead Less