This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 20:12:20 (UTC).

Erica Andrade vs. Shannon Soliz, R.N.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Erica Andrade filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Shannon Soliz, R N. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0235

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrade, Erica

Gonzalez, Abel

Defendants

Saint Agnes Medical Center

Soliz, R.N., Shannon

Woods, R.N., Natalie

Salazar, R.N., Marisol

Hernandez, M.D., Daniel

Carefusion 303, Inc.

Doe 1

Carefusion Corporation

Doe 2

Doe 3

Soliz, RN, Natalie

Becton, Dickinson and Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stirrup, Adam B.

Defendant Attorneys

Casheros, Jerry D.

White, William M.

Yeung, Anna

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

3-25-22 Amended Notice of Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

03/25/2022: 3-25-22 Amended Notice of Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

2/23/22 Proof of Service

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Proof of Service

2/23/22 Separate Statement

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Separate Statement

2/23/22 Memorandum of Points & Authorities

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/23/22 Request

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Request

2/23/22 Declaration

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Declaration

2/23/22 Statement

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Statement

2/23/22 Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

02/23/2022: 2/23/22 Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

Stipulation and Order filed

02/10/2022: Stipulation and Order filed

2/9/22 proposed stip protective order

02/09/2022: 2/9/22 proposed stip protective order

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

01/20/2022: Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

12/16/21 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/16/2021: 12/16/21 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 6-9 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSummary Judgment; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Jerry Casheros

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Ana Yeung

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Notice of Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketLodged Materials Received; Comment: CD - Exhibits 1-12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saint Agnes Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-11639 Saint Agnes Medical Center $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saint Agnes Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service - Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Andrade, Erica: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-04241 Andrade, Erica $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Andrade, Erica: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Andrade, Erica; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carefusion 303 Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CareFusion Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Saint Agnes Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY is a litigant