This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 15:03:33 (UTC).

Eric Shambourger vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Eric Shambourger filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1692

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shambourger, Eric

Shambourger, Shawna

Defendants

General Motors LLC

a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yang, Michelle

 

Court Documents

6/3/22 Complaint

06/03/2022: 6/3/22 Complaint

6/3/22 Civil Case Cover sheet

06/03/2022: 6/3/22 Civil Case Cover sheet

6/6/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

06/06/2022: 6/6/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

6/6/22 Summons

06/06/2022: 6/6/22 Summons

6/13/22 Proof of Service

06/13/2022: 6/13/22 Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shambourger, Eric: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-33984 SHAMBOURGER, ERIC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shambourger, Eric: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Shambourger, Eric; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YANG MICHELLE