This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:57:55 (UTC).

Enrique Mercado vs. The People of the State of California

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Enrique Mercado filed an Other lawsuit against The People of the State of California. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Alvarez, Brian and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2801

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Alvarez, Brian

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Appellant

Mercado, Enrique E.

Respondent

The People of the State of California

 

Court Documents

Appellate Remittitur Issued

Appellate Remittitur Issued

Receipt in Appellate Matter filed

Receipt in Appellate Matter filed; Comment: Receipt for (completed record received to the lower court ) in Appellate Matter filed.

Receipt filed

Receipt filed; Comment: Original Exhibits received by Lower Court (Traffic) Dept.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Receipt filed

Receipt filed; Comment: Certified Original Transcripts for 3/14/19 hearing filed 12/5/19

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Brian; Comment: Order Augmenting the Record on Appeal.

Judgment

Judgment in Appellate case entered with opinion; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Brian; Judgment Type: Judgment in Appellate case entered with opinion; Party Names: Mercado, Enrique E.; The People of the State of California

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Order continuing the hearing and Ordering the clerk to provide the earlier transcript.

Appellate Document filed

Appellate Document filed; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Record on Appeal and Receipt of Record

Receipt in Appellate Matter filed

03/12/2020: Receipt in Appellate Matter filed

Receipt filed

03/12/2020: Receipt filed

Appellate Remittitur Issued

03/09/2020: Appellate Remittitur Issued

Order filed

02/05/2020: Order filed

Minute Order Attachment

02/05/2020: Minute Order Attachment

Receipt filed

01/13/2020: Receipt filed

Order filed

12/04/2019: Order filed

Notice of Hearing

12/04/2019: Notice of Hearing

Appellate Document filed

12/04/2019: Appellate Document filed

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt in Appellate Matter filed; Comment: Receipt for (completed record received to the lower court ) in Appellate Matter filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt filed; Comment: Original Exhibits received by Lower Court (Traffic) Dept.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate Remittitur Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Brian; Judgment Type: Judgment in Appellate case entered with opinion; Party; Names: Mercado, Enrique E.; The People of the State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Brian; Comment: Order Augmenting the Record on Appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketHearing - Appeal; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt filed; Comment: Certified Original Transcripts for 3/14/19 hearing filed 12/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Order continuing the hearing and Ordering the clerk to provide the earlier transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Per Order continuing the hearing from 12/4/19 to 2/5/2020 and Ordering the clerk to provide the earlier transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellants Opening Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Appellant's Opening Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Received; Comment: from Enrique E. Mercado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed; Comment: 1st revised

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtension of Time to File Opening Brief; Comment: Order extending time for filing of appellant's opening brief to (8/15/19) signed by Judge R. McGuire filed in Appellate Dept. 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Notice to file Ext of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept:403 Order for:Ext of Time for Opening Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed; Comment: attached is sample of Opining Brief; Ext. of time and Proof of services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate Document filed; Comment: Completed record

    Read MoreRead Less