This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/06/2023 at 12:24:50 (UTC).

Employers Preferred Insurance Company vs. Kari Schilling

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 Employers Preferred Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kari Schilling. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Whalen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0881

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Whalen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Employers Preferred Insurance Company

Defendant

Schilling, Kari

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bustos, Juan Jose

Defendant Attorney

Marcotte, Adam L

 

Court Documents

3-7-23 Complaint

03/07/2023: 3-7-23 Complaint

3-7-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/07/2023: 3-7-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

3-9-23 Summons

03/09/2023: 3-9-23 Summons

3-9-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

03/09/2023: 3-9-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4/6/2023-Notice of Related Case

04/06/2023: 4/6/2023-Notice of Related Case

4/22/23 Deft's Notice of Jury Deposit

04/24/2023: 4/22/23 Deft's Notice of Jury Deposit

4/22/23 Answer

04/24/2023: 4/22/23 Answer

4/22/23 Defts Demand for Jury Trial

04/24/2023: 4/22/23 Defts Demand for Jury Trial

4/22/23 Request for Production of EPIC

04/24/2023: 4/22/23 Request for Production of EPIC

4/22/23 Form Interrogatories to EPIC

04/24/2023: 4/22/23 Form Interrogatories to EPIC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Schilling, Kari: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-27720 Schilling, Kari $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Schilling, Kari: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Schilling, Kari; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed; Comment: Form Interrogatories to EPIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Filed; Comment: Request for Production of EPIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed; Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Related Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Employers Preferred Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-16319 Employers Preferred Insurance Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Employers Preferred Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Employers Preferred Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less