This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 04:16:18 (UTC).

Elizabeth Mendoza vs. Collette Shannon

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Elizabeth Mendoza filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Collette Shannon. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3431

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mendoza, Elizabeth

Defendants

Shannon, Collette

Paragon Healthcare, Inc.

a California corporation

Xcel Reimbursement Solutions, LLC

a Texas limited liability company

Westcare, Inc.

Paragon Infusion Care, a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kingery, Nathan

Defendant Attorney

Al-Chalati-Moeller, Danielle

 

Court Documents

3/15/2022 Minute Order Attachment

03/15/2022: 3/15/2022 Minute Order Attachment

3/11/22 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

03/11/2022: 3/11/22 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

3/1/22 Ntc of Jury Fees

03/01/2022: 3/1/22 Ntc of Jury Fees

2/28/2021-Case Management Statement

02/28/2022: 2/28/2021-Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.pdf

02/28/2022: Case Management Statement.pdf

2/25/2022-Westcare Inc's First Appearance fee.

02/25/2022: 2/25/2022-Westcare Inc's First Appearance fee.

2/24/2022-Answer

02/24/2022: 2/24/2022-Answer

12/20/21 - Proof of Service

12/20/2021: 12/20/21 - Proof of Service

12/15/21 Proof of Service

12/15/2021: 12/15/21 Proof of Service

12-10-21 Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint of Paragon Healthcare, Inc.

12/10/2021: 12-10-21 Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint of Paragon Healthcare, Inc.

12-1-21 Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint for Xcel Reimbursement Solutions, LLC

12/01/2021: 12-1-21 Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint for Xcel Reimbursement Solutions, LLC

12-1-21 Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint for Westcare Inc.

12/01/2021: 12-1-21 Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint for Westcare Inc.

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

11/19/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

11/18/21 - Summons

11/19/2021: 11/18/21 - Summons

11/18/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: 11/18/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/21 - Complaint

11/18/2021: 11/18/21 - Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Time Estimate 5-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketJury Requested by Party; Comment: Time estimeate 5-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Intent to Appear by Telephone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mendoza, Elizabeth: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-12893 Mendoza, Elizabeth $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mendoza, Elizabeth: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 11/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mendoza, Elizabeth: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-73719 Mendoza, Elizabeth $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mendoza, Elizabeth: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Mendoza, Elizabeth; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Paragon Infusion Care, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Paragon Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where a Texas limited liability company is a litigant