This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 18:03:04 (UTC).

Elizabeth Gomez vs Pedro Porras

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Elizabeth Gomez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Pedro Porras. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guerra, Amy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3858

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guerra, Amy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gomez, Elizabeth

Respondent

Porras, Pedro Gomez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketTRO Order to Show Cause- Judicial Officer: Guerra, Amy; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAffidavit- Comment: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service w/ Declaration of Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDomestic Violence OSC- Comment: (Zoom Info Provided)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketReturn Letter- Comment: All Documents Returned To Calendar Without File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketApplication and Declaration for Order DV w/o Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less