This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 04:14:06 (UTC).

Eliza Duarte vs Yuliana Villalobos

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Eliza Duarte filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Yuliana Villalobos. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3453

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duarte, Eliza Hernandez

Defendant

Villalobos, Yuliana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kreit, Theodore

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

11/18/21 - Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

11/18/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

11/19/21 - Summons

Notice of Hearing

11/19/21 - CV-48 Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes HRG 3/15/22; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

11/18/21 - Complaint

11/18/2021: 11/18/21 - Complaint

11/18/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: 11/18/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/21 - Summons

11/19/2021: 11/19/21 - Summons

11/19/21 - CV-48 Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes HRG 3/15/22

11/19/2021: 11/19/21 - CV-48 Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes HRG 3/15/22

2/17/2022-Request for Dismissal

02/17/2022: 2/17/2022-Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Duarte, Eliza Hernandez; Villalobos, Yuliana; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Duarte, Eliza Hernandez: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-73876 Duarte, Eliza Hernandez $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Duarte, Eliza Hernandez: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Duarte, Eliza Hernandez; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KREIT THEODORE