This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 20:38:39 (UTC).

Elaine Reyman (Estate)

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Elaine Reyman Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arax, Brian M and Cardoza, Jane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0940

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arax, Brian M

Cardoza, Jane

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Executor

Claiborne, Raylene Joy, CPA

Decedent

Reyman, Elaine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

Beaumont, Nanette M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2023
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing; Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing; Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final); Comment: Total Amount: $665,509.94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketReturn Letter; Comment: Re: Letter to Judge, Copy Notice of RA, Copy Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (submitted by Mary Jane Lopez)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Claiborne, Raylene Joy, CPA: Mail Payment Receipt # PR-2022-00001222 Nanette M. Beaumont $121.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Claiborne, Raylene Joy, CPA: Transaction Assessment $121.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketLetters (Estates); Comment: cc emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOrder for Probate; Judicial Officer: Cardoza, Jane; Comment: cc emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: *Confidential* Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPetition - Probate; Judicial Officer: Cardoza, Jane; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance.; Comment: 1 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Comment: Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Claiborne, Raylene Joy, CPA: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-50975 Claiborne, Raylene Joy $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Claiborne, Raylene Joy, CPA: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Claiborne, Raylene Joy, CPA; Total Financial Assessment $556.50; Total Payments and Credits $556.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPetition for Probate (Initial); Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less