This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 17:33:43 (UTC).

E M Tharp, Inc vs. American Trucking Solutions Inc

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 E M Tharp, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against American Trucking Solutions Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0043

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E M Tharp, Inc.

Golden State Peterbilt

E M Tharp, Inc

Defendant

American Trucking Solutions Inc

 

Court Documents

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; E M Tharp, Inc; Awarded Against:; American Trucking Solutions Inc; Amount; Damages: $4,374.64; Costs: $115.00; Total: $4489.64; Party Names: E M Tharp, Inc; American Trucking Solutions Inc

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: OX incorrect

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $4,489.64

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Re: Abstract-The name on #3 must match the name on the Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Ginnie Sterling, manager

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Re: New claim

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketOrder of Examination- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for E M Tharp, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2021-00001873 E M Tharp, Inc $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for E M Tharp, Inc: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Examination- Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: OX incorrect

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for E M Tharp, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2021-00001325 Ginnie Sterling $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for E M Tharp, Inc: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $4,489.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Re: Abstract-The name on #3 must match the name on the Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: E M Tharp, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Received- Letter Received; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for E M Tharp, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2021-00000221 E M Tharp, Inc. $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for E M Tharp, Inc: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: E M Tharp, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $150.00; Total Payments and Credits $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Received- Letter Received; Comment: Re: New claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden State Peterbilt is a litigant

Latest cases where E M THARP INC is a litigant