This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 10:56:00 (UTC).

D.P. Chapanian Inc. vs. Mohamed Alhalemi

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 D P Chapanian Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mohamed Alhalemi. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2623

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.P. Chapanian Inc.

Defendant

Alhalemi, Mohamed H.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Marta Chapanian, V/P

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Donald P Chapanian, President

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service - Mohamed H Alhalemi

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; D.P. Chapanian Inc.; Awarded Against:; Alhalemi, Mohamed H.; Amount; Damages: $4,355.12; Costs: $90.00; Total: $4445.12; Party Names: D.P. Chapanian Inc.; Alhalemi, Mohamed H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Marta Chapanian, V/P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Donald P Chapanian, President

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: D.P. Chapanian Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit- Affidavit; Comment: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service - Mohamed H Alhalemi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for D.P. Chapanian Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00014151 D.P. Chapanian Inc. $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for D.P. Chapanian Inc.: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: D.P. Chapanian Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less